+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 30, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- BFS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FI 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor