+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 174, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor