+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM failed. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.