+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice .
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held on first reading.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor