+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.