+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 37, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- CRJ - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor