+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- First Reading. (View Original Bill)
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.