+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)