+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 180, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 18). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)