+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 304, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Ways & Means. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- SGTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (SEIT 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government, Elections & Information Technology. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)