+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LG 20). (View 1st Substitute)
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)