+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 195, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- No action on notice to reconsider vote on final passage.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TED 16).
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- GGIT - Majority; do pass TED 16 bill proposed by Technology & Economic Development.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).