+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2016.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 191, 2016 Laws.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 16).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2839-S2 AMS BAUM S5197.1
NOT ADOPTED 03/10/2016
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor