+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- EENT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TED 18). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)