+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 108, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- PS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor