+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor