+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)