+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 132, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Held on third reading.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FIN 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 16, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor