+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).