+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (10)
McBride
Type:
Primary Sponsor