+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor