+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (SGOV 20). (View 1st Substitute)
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor