+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HSMH - Majority; do pass.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ELHS 16).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass ELHS 16 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).