+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor