+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 14).
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 12:00 PM.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor