+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/12/2014.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 196, 2014 Laws.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Minority; without recommendation.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APPE 14).
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM.
- APPE - Executive action taken by committee.
- APPE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ELHS - Majority; do pass.
- ELHS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 6:00 PM.
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (9)
Ortiz-Self
Type:
Primary Sponsor