+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 172, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Ways & Means. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill not substituted. (View 1st Substitute)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Agriculture & Natural Resources. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor