+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CB 14).
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- CB - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor