+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- SGTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (SEIT 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)