+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:30 AM.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).