+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 3/22/2018*.
- Chapter 171, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ELHS 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)