+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2698 AMH LYTT FRAS 673
ADOPTED 02/17/2016
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor