+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor