+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (JUDI 16).
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- GGIT - Majority; do pass JUDI 16 bill proposed by Judiciary.
- Minority; without recommendation.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).