+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading suspension calendar.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:30 AM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).