+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)