+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).