+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)