+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor