+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- FIHI - Majority; do pass.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- CDHT - Majority; do pass.
- CDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2558 AMH FEYJ FLYN 101
ADOPTED 02/13/2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor