+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM.
- Referred to Finance.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (12)
Frame
Type:
Primary Sponsor