+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- SGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor