+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).