+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
- Referred to Rules.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOE - Majority; do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (2)
2473 AMS LIIA S5014.1
PULLED 03/06/2014