+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- LBRC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (COG 18). (View 1st Substitute)
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)