+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- PS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor