+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 231, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 16, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- ED - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor