+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 340, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Health & Long Term Care. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 20). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 16, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 8, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. (View Original Bill)