+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor