+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 96, 2016 Laws.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from amendments.
- Held on calendar.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 16).
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (14)
2439-S2.E AMS ENGR S5157.E (ENGR)
2439-S2.E AMS ENGR S5157.E (ENGR)
2439-S2.E AMS OBAN S5196.1
ADOPTED 03/10/2016
2439-S2.E AMS ENGR S5157.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 03/10/2016
2439-S2.E AMS OBAN S5157.1
ADOPTED 03/10/2016
2439-S2.E AMS ENGR S5083.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 03/03/2016
2439-S2.E AMS LITZ S5121.1
ADOPTED 03/03/2016
2439-S2.E AMS LITZ S5108.2
PULLED 03/03/2016
2439-S2.E AMS FROC CANT 066
ADOPTED 03/03/2016
2439-S2.E AMS OBAN S5083.1
ADOPTED 03/03/2016
2439-S2.E AMS HARG S5085.1
PULLED 03/03/2016
2439-S2.E AMS HSMH S4979.1
NOT ADOPTED 03/03/2016
2439-S2 AMH SCOT PAIA 075
WITHDRAWN 02/16/2016
2439-S2 AMH KAGI PAIA 076
ADOPTED 02/16/2016
2439-S2 AMH DENT PAIA 077
ADOPTED 02/16/2016
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor